स्टाफ़
NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, ITANAGAR
(As on 29.02.2024)
Sl No | Name of the Employee | Designation | Category [S&T / Non S&T] | Group | Date of Joining NIELIT | Date of Joining Present Centre | Date of Joining the present post |
Category (Gen/ SC/ST/ OBC) |
Moblie No. | Email ID |
1. | Shri. RK Bigensana Singh | Director In-Charge | S&T | A | 01.07.2005 | 03.07.2024 | 19.09.2017 | GEN | 9856070561 | dir-itanagar@nielit.gov.in |
2. | Shri. Anup Kumar | Scientist 'D' | S&T | A | 30.09.2016 | 30.09.2016 | 31.03.2023 | GEN | 9366872226 | anupkumar@nielit.gov.in |
3. | Shri Ashok Kumar | Assistant | Non-S&T | C | 22.10.1996 | 12.09.2023 | 01.07.2018 | GEN | 7985215181 | ashok@nielit.gov.in |
4. | Shri Shammi Sharma | Technical Assistant | S&T | C | 14.12.2016 | 28.10.2017 | 01.12.2021 | GEN | 8285824320 | shammisharma@nielit.gov.in |
5. | Shri. Anan Tyring | Junior Assistant | Non-S&T | C | 29.12.2020 | 06.06.2022 | 29.12.2020 | ST | 7002728835 | anantyring@nielit.gov.in |
Public Information Officer |
Shri Shammi Sharma, Technical Assistant Mobile No. 8285824320 |
Vigilance Officer |
Shri C.Zoremsanga, Scientist 'C' Mobile No. 9862855151 |
Public Grievance Officer |
Shri Shammi Sharma, Technical Assistant Mobile No. 8285824320 |